House
|
03/03/2023
|
House/ filed in House file for bills not passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Comm - Held in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 1 to # 2 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
House/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senate/ received from House in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
House/ to standing committee in House Revenue and Taxation Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
02/09/2023
|
Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|
|
02/09/2023
|
Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|