Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0436 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 13, 2023
Bill February 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 23, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023