Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0448 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2023
Fiscal Note February 25, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 22, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 24, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023
Analysis February 20, 2023