Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 16, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023

Amended

Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 22, 2023