1 | 1 | | H.B. 479 |
---|
2 | 2 | | LEGISLATIVE GENERAL COUNSEL |
---|
3 | 3 | | 6 Approved for Filing: S. Larson 6 |
---|
4 | 4 | | 6 02-14-23 4:51 PM 6 |
---|
5 | 5 | | H.B. 479 |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1 CORRECTIONS TASK FORCE |
---|
7 | 7 | | 2 2023 GENERAL SESSION |
---|
8 | 8 | | 3 STATE OF UTAH |
---|
9 | 9 | | 4 Chief Sponsor: Jefferson S. Burton |
---|
10 | 10 | | 5 Senate Sponsor: ____________ |
---|
11 | 11 | | 6 |
---|
12 | 12 | | 7LONG TITLE |
---|
13 | 13 | | 8General Description: |
---|
14 | 14 | | 9 This bill creates the Corrections Task Force. |
---|
15 | 15 | | 10Highlighted Provisions: |
---|
16 | 16 | | 11 This bill: |
---|
17 | 17 | | 12 <creates the Corrections Task Force; |
---|
18 | 18 | | 13 <includes a sunset date; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | 14 <makes technical and conforming changes. |
---|
20 | 20 | | 15Money Appropriated in this Bill: |
---|
21 | 21 | | 16 None |
---|
22 | 22 | | 17Other Special Clauses: |
---|
23 | 23 | | 18 None |
---|
24 | 24 | | 19Utah Code Sections Affected: |
---|
25 | 25 | | 20AMENDS: |
---|
26 | 26 | | 21 63I-1-236, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2022, Chapters 175, 247 |
---|
27 | 27 | | 22ENACTS: |
---|
28 | 28 | | 23 36-29-112, Utah Code Annotated 1953 |
---|
29 | 29 | | 24 |
---|
30 | 30 | | 25Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah: |
---|
31 | 31 | | 26 Section 1. Section 36-29-112 is enacted to read: |
---|
32 | 32 | | 27 36-29-112. Corrections Task Force. |
---|
33 | 33 | | *HB0479* H.B. 479 02-14-23 4:51 PM |
---|
34 | 34 | | - 2 - |
---|
35 | 35 | | 28 (1) As used in this section, "task force" means the Corrections Task Force created in |
---|
36 | 36 | | 29this section. |
---|
37 | 37 | | 30 (2) There is created the Corrections Task Force consisting of the following 15 |
---|
38 | 38 | | 31members: |
---|
39 | 39 | | 32 (a) two members of the Senate appointed by the president of the Senate, no more than |
---|
40 | 40 | | 33two of whom may be from the same political party; |
---|
41 | 41 | | 34 (b) three members of the House of Representatives appointed by the speaker of the |
---|
42 | 42 | | 35House of Representatives, no more than two of whom may be from the same political party; |
---|
43 | 43 | | 36 (c) the executive director of the State Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice or |
---|
44 | 44 | | 37the executive director's designee; |
---|
45 | 45 | | 38 (d) the director of the Sentencing Commission or the director's designee; |
---|
46 | 46 | | 39 (e) the executive director of the Utah Department of Corrections or the executive |
---|
47 | 47 | | 40director's designee; |
---|
48 | 48 | | 41 (f) the executive director of the Department of Workforce Services or the director's |
---|
49 | 49 | | 42designee; |
---|
50 | 50 | | 43 (g) an individual designated by the Board of Pardons and Parole; |
---|
51 | 51 | | 44 (h) an individual designated by the Utah Sheriffs' Association; |
---|
52 | 52 | | 45 (i) an individual designated by the Utah Substance Use and Mental Health Advisory |
---|
53 | 53 | | 46Council; |
---|
54 | 54 | | 47 (j) an individual who represents an association of corrections officers, appointed by the |
---|
55 | 55 | | 48president of the Senate; |
---|
56 | 56 | | 49 (k) an individual who represents an association of inmate advocates, appointed by the |
---|
57 | 57 | | 50speaker of the House of Representatives; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | 51 (l) an individual who represents an association of victim advocates, appointed by the |
---|
59 | 59 | | 52speaker of the House of Representatives. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 53 (3) (a) The president of the Senate shall designate a member of the Senate appointed |
---|
61 | 61 | | 54under Subsection (2)(a) as a cochair of the task force. |
---|
62 | 62 | | 55 (b) The speaker of the House of Representatives shall designate a member of the House |
---|
63 | 63 | | 56of Representatives appointed under Subsection (2)(b) as a cochair of the task force. |
---|
64 | 64 | | 57 (4) (a) A majority of the members of the task force constitutes a quorum. |
---|
65 | 65 | | 58 (b) The action of a majority of a quorum constitutes an action of the task force. 02-14-23 4:51 PM H.B. 479 |
---|
66 | 66 | | - 3 - |
---|
67 | 67 | | 59 (5) (a) Salaries and expenses of the members of the task force who are legislators shall |
---|
68 | 68 | | 60be paid in accordance with Section 36-2-2 and Legislative Joint Rules, Title 5, Chapter 3, |
---|
69 | 69 | | 61Legislator Compensation. |
---|
70 | 70 | | 62 (b) A member of the task force who is not a legislator: |
---|
71 | 71 | | 63 (i) may not receive compensation for the member's service on the task force; and |
---|
72 | 72 | | 64 (ii) may receive per diem and reimbursement for travel expenses incurred as a member |
---|
73 | 73 | | 65of the task force at the rates established by the Division of Finance under Sections 63A-3-106 |
---|
74 | 74 | | 66and 63A-3-107. |
---|
75 | 75 | | 67 (6) The Office of Legislative Research and General Counsel shall provide staff support |
---|
76 | 76 | | 68to the task force. |
---|
77 | 77 | | 69 (7) The task force shall review, research, and make recommendations regarding issues |
---|
78 | 78 | | 70affecting the operation of correctional facilities. |
---|
79 | 79 | | 71 (8) Beginning in 2024, the task force shall, on or before May 30, provide a report, |
---|
80 | 80 | | 72including any recommendations for legislation, to: |
---|
81 | 81 | | 73 (a) the Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Interim Committee; and |
---|
82 | 82 | | 74 (b) the Legislative Management Committee. |
---|
83 | 83 | | 75 Section 2. Section 63I-1-236 is amended to read: |
---|
84 | 84 | | 76 63I-1-236. Repeal dates: Title 36. |
---|
85 | 85 | | 77 (1) Title 36, Chapter 17, Legislative Process Committee, is repealed January 1, 2028. |
---|
86 | 86 | | 78 (2) Section 36-12-20 is repealed June 30, 2023. |
---|
87 | 87 | | 79 (3) Title 36, Chapter 28, Veterans and Military Affairs Commission, is repealed |
---|
88 | 88 | | 80January 1, 2025. |
---|
89 | 89 | | 81 (4) Section 36-29-108, Criminal Code Evaluation Task Force, is repealed July 1, 2023. |
---|
90 | 90 | | 82 (5) Section 36-29-112, Corrections Task Force, is repealed July 1, 2024. |
---|
91 | 91 | | 83 [(5)] (6) Title 36, Chapter 31, Martha Hughes Cannon Capitol Statue Oversight |
---|
92 | 92 | | 84Committee, is repealed January 1, 2022. |
---|