H.B. 479 LEGISLATIVE GENERAL COUNSEL 6 Approved for Filing: S. Larson 6 6 02-14-23 4:51 PM 6 H.B. 479 1 CORRECTIONS TASK FORCE 2 2023 GENERAL SESSION 3 STATE OF UTAH 4 Chief Sponsor: Jefferson S. Burton 5 Senate Sponsor: ____________ 6 7LONG TITLE 8General Description: 9 This bill creates the Corrections Task Force. 10Highlighted Provisions: 11 This bill: 12 <creates the Corrections Task Force; 13 <includes a sunset date; and 14 <makes technical and conforming changes. 15Money Appropriated in this Bill: 16 None 17Other Special Clauses: 18 None 19Utah Code Sections Affected: 20AMENDS: 21 63I-1-236, as last amended by Laws of Utah 2022, Chapters 175, 247 22ENACTS: 23 36-29-112, Utah Code Annotated 1953 24 25Be it enacted by the Legislature of the state of Utah: 26 Section 1. Section 36-29-112 is enacted to read: 27 36-29-112. Corrections Task Force. *HB0479* H.B. 479 02-14-23 4:51 PM - 2 - 28 (1) As used in this section, "task force" means the Corrections Task Force created in 29this section. 30 (2) There is created the Corrections Task Force consisting of the following 15 31members: 32 (a) two members of the Senate appointed by the president of the Senate, no more than 33two of whom may be from the same political party; 34 (b) three members of the House of Representatives appointed by the speaker of the 35House of Representatives, no more than two of whom may be from the same political party; 36 (c) the executive director of the State Commission on Criminal and Juvenile Justice or 37the executive director's designee; 38 (d) the director of the Sentencing Commission or the director's designee; 39 (e) the executive director of the Utah Department of Corrections or the executive 40director's designee; 41 (f) the executive director of the Department of Workforce Services or the director's 42designee; 43 (g) an individual designated by the Board of Pardons and Parole; 44 (h) an individual designated by the Utah Sheriffs' Association; 45 (i) an individual designated by the Utah Substance Use and Mental Health Advisory 46Council; 47 (j) an individual who represents an association of corrections officers, appointed by the 48president of the Senate; 49 (k) an individual who represents an association of inmate advocates, appointed by the 50speaker of the House of Representatives; and 51 (l) an individual who represents an association of victim advocates, appointed by the 52speaker of the House of Representatives. 53 (3) (a) The president of the Senate shall designate a member of the Senate appointed 54under Subsection (2)(a) as a cochair of the task force. 55 (b) The speaker of the House of Representatives shall designate a member of the House 56of Representatives appointed under Subsection (2)(b) as a cochair of the task force. 57 (4) (a) A majority of the members of the task force constitutes a quorum. 58 (b) The action of a majority of a quorum constitutes an action of the task force. 02-14-23 4:51 PM H.B. 479 - 3 - 59 (5) (a) Salaries and expenses of the members of the task force who are legislators shall 60be paid in accordance with Section 36-2-2 and Legislative Joint Rules, Title 5, Chapter 3, 61Legislator Compensation. 62 (b) A member of the task force who is not a legislator: 63 (i) may not receive compensation for the member's service on the task force; and 64 (ii) may receive per diem and reimbursement for travel expenses incurred as a member 65of the task force at the rates established by the Division of Finance under Sections 63A-3-106 66and 63A-3-107. 67 (6) The Office of Legislative Research and General Counsel shall provide staff support 68to the task force. 69 (7) The task force shall review, research, and make recommendations regarding issues 70affecting the operation of correctional facilities. 71 (8) Beginning in 2024, the task force shall, on or before May 30, provide a report, 72including any recommendations for legislation, to: 73 (a) the Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Interim Committee; and 74 (b) the Legislative Management Committee. 75 Section 2. Section 63I-1-236 is amended to read: 76 63I-1-236. Repeal dates: Title 36. 77 (1) Title 36, Chapter 17, Legislative Process Committee, is repealed January 1, 2028. 78 (2) Section 36-12-20 is repealed June 30, 2023. 79 (3) Title 36, Chapter 28, Veterans and Military Affairs Commission, is repealed 80January 1, 2025. 81 (4) Section 36-29-108, Criminal Code Evaluation Task Force, is repealed July 1, 2023. 82 (5) Section 36-29-112, Corrections Task Force, is repealed July 1, 2024. 83 [(5)] (6) Title 36, Chapter 31, Martha Hughes Cannon Capitol Statue Oversight 84Committee, is repealed January 1, 2022.