Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note February 24, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 2, 2023
Analysis February 22, 2023

Amended

Bill February 23, 2023