Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 2, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis March 1, 2023