|
03/13/2023
|
House/ to Lieutenant Governor in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
House/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
House/ enrolled bill to Printing in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
02/23/2023
|
Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
|
02/23/2023
|
Bill Received from House for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ signed by Speaker/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2023
|
House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for House bills
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House
|
|
|
|
02/02/2023
|
Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
|
|
|