Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HR0001 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2023
Fiscal Note February 11, 2023
Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill February 2, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 10, 2023

Amended

Bill February 8, 2023