Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0076 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note January 20, 2025
Bill January 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2025

Amended

Bill February 28, 2025
Bill February 6, 2025

Substitute

Bill February 14, 2025