Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 27, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note February 19, 2025
Fiscal Note February 5, 2025
Bill February 3, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 14, 2025

Amended

Bill February 27, 2025

Substitute

Bill February 25, 2025
Bill February 19, 2025
Bill February 18, 2025