Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah Senate Bill SB0062 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2025
Fiscal Note March 5, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note January 24, 2025
Fiscal Note January 10, 2025
Bill January 3, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 12, 2025

Substitute

Bill March 6, 2025
Bill March 4, 2025
Bill February 13, 2025
Bill January 23, 2025

Amended

Bill January 28, 2025