Utah 2025 Regular Session

Utah Senate Bill SB0290 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 7, 2025
Fiscal Note February 27, 2025
Fiscal Note February 26, 2025
Fiscal Note February 19, 2025
Bill February 17, 2025

Enrolled

Bill March 13, 2025

Substitute

Bill March 7, 2025
Bill February 25, 2025
Bill February 24, 2025