|
03/21/2025
|
Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
|
|
|
|
03/21/2025
|
Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (Effective 07/01/27)
|
|
|
|
03/11/2025
|
Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 24, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2025
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Signed by President
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Fiscal Impact Statement from Department of Planning and Budget (HB1910)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Signed by Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1910ER)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2025
|
Enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Senate Amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Engrossed by Senate as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Education and Health Amendment agreed to
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Reading of amendment waived
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Passed by for the day
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 2nd reading)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2025
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2025
|
Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2025
|
Assigned Education sub: Public Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Education and Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2025
|
Constitutional reading dispensed (on 1st reading)
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2025
|
Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Printed as engrossed 25101008D-E
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Engrossed by House as amended
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Education Amendment agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/15/2025
|
Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2025
|
Assigned Educ sub: K-12 Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2025
|
Referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2025
|
Prefiled and ordered printed; Offered 01-13-2025 25101008D
|
|
|