10 | 16 | | |
---|
11 | 17 | | |
---|
12 | 18 | | |
---|
13 | 19 | | RESOLVED by the House of Delegates, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective general district court judgeships as follows: |
---|
14 | 20 | | |
---|
15 | 21 | | Derek A. Wagner, Esquire, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025. |
---|
16 | 22 | | |
---|
17 | 23 | | James Matthew Haynes, Jr., Esquire, of Northampton, as a judge of the Judicial District 2-A for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
18 | 24 | | |
---|
19 | 25 | | Vaughn T. Breedlove, Esquire, of Suffolk, as a judge of the Fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
20 | 26 | | |
---|
21 | 27 | | William S. Newsome, Esquire, of Emporia, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
22 | 28 | | |
---|
23 | 29 | | Shukita L. Massey, Esquire, of Newport News, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. |
---|
24 | 30 | | |
---|
25 | 31 | | James Anderson Mullins, Esquire, of York, as a judge of the Ninth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
26 | 32 | | |
---|
27 | 33 | | Brian H. Jones, Esquire, of Powhatan, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
28 | 34 | | |
---|
29 | 35 | | Jennifer E. S. Rosen, Esquire, of Richmond, as a judge of the Thirteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
30 | 36 | | |
---|
31 | 37 | | Adam M. Krischer, Esquire, of Arlington, as a judge of the Seventeenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
32 | 38 | | |
---|
33 | 39 | | Raymond J. Obregon, Esquire, of Fairfax County, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
34 | 40 | | |
---|
35 | 41 | | Suzan E. Moore, Esquire, of Washington, as a judge of the Twenty-eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025. |
---|
36 | 42 | | |
---|
37 | 43 | | Fernando Villarroel, Esquire, of Fairfax, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|