2025 SESSION ENROLLED HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 803 Nominating persons to be elected to general district court judgeships. Agreed to by the House of Delegates, February 19, 2025 RESOLVED by the House of Delegates, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective general district court judgeships as follows: Derek A. Wagner, Esquire, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025. James Matthew Haynes, Jr., Esquire, of Northampton, as a judge of the Judicial District 2-A for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. Vaughn T. Breedlove, Esquire, of Suffolk, as a judge of the Fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. William S. Newsome, Esquire, of Emporia, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. Shukita L. Massey, Esquire, of Newport News, as a judge of the Eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. James Anderson Mullins, Esquire, of York, as a judge of the Ninth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. Brian H. Jones, Esquire, of Powhatan, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. Jennifer E. S. Rosen, Esquire, of Richmond, as a judge of the Thirteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. Adam M. Krischer, Esquire, of Arlington, as a judge of the Seventeenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. Raymond J. Obregon, Esquire, of Fairfax County, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. Suzan E. Moore, Esquire, of Washington, as a judge of the Twenty-eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025. Fernando Villarroel, Esquire, of Fairfax, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.