1 | 1 | | 2025 SESSION |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | ENROLLED |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 206 |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | Nominating persons to be elected to general district court judgeships. |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | |
---|
12 | 12 | | |
---|
13 | 13 | | Agreed to by the Senate, January 14, 2025 |
---|
14 | 14 | | |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | |
---|
17 | 17 | | RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective general district court judgeships as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | |
---|
19 | 19 | | The Honorable Erin L. Evans-Bedois, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | The Honorable Sandra S. Menago, of Virginia Beach, as a judge of the Second Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025. |
---|
22 | 22 | | |
---|
23 | 23 | | The Honorable Nicole A. Belote, of Suffolk, as a judge of the Fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
24 | 24 | | |
---|
25 | 25 | | The Honorable Elbert D. Mumphery, of Hopewell, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
26 | 26 | | |
---|
27 | 27 | | The Honorable Robert G. Saunders, of Newport News, as a judge of the Seventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
28 | 28 | | |
---|
29 | 29 | | The Honorable Jody H. Fariss, of Prince Edward, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. |
---|
30 | 30 | | |
---|
31 | 31 | | The Honorable Darrel W. Puckett, of Appomattox, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. |
---|
32 | 32 | | |
---|
33 | 33 | | The Honorable Calvin S. Spencer, Jr., of Lunenburg, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025. |
---|
34 | 34 | | |
---|
35 | 35 | | The Honorable Thomas Stark, IV, of Powhatan, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025. |
---|
36 | 36 | | |
---|
37 | 37 | | The Honorable Keith Nelson Hurley, of Chesterfield, as a judge of the Twelfth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
38 | 38 | | |
---|
39 | 39 | | The Honorable Lauren A. Caudill, of Henrico, as a judge of the Fourteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. |
---|
40 | 40 | | |
---|
41 | 41 | | The Honorable George Barton Chucker, of Henrico, as a judge of the Fourteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | The Honorable Hugh S. Campbell, of Hanover, as a judge of the Fifteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
44 | 44 | | |
---|
45 | 45 | | The Honorable Angela M. O'Connor, of Hanover, as a judge of the Fifteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
46 | 46 | | |
---|
47 | 47 | | The Honorable Matthew J. Quatrara, of Albemarle, as a judge of the Sixteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025. |
---|
48 | 48 | | |
---|
49 | 49 | | The Honorable Jason S. Rucker, of Arlington, as a judge of the Seventeenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing March 16, 2025. |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | The Honorable Susan F. Earman, of Fairfax City, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
52 | 52 | | |
---|
53 | 53 | | The Honorable Joan Ziglar, of Martinsville, as a judge of the Twenty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
54 | 54 | | |
---|
55 | 55 | | The Honorable Christopher M. Billias, of Rockbridge, as a judge of the Twenty-fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025. |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | The Honorable Travis B. Lee, of Smyth, as a judge of the Twenty-eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | The Honorable Henry A. Barringer, of Tazewell, as a judge of the Twenty-ninth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | The Honorable Turkessa B. Rollins, of Prince William, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025. |
---|