Virginia 2025 Regular Session

Virginia Senate Bill SR206 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 01/14/2025

                            2025 SESSION

ENROLLED

SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 206

Nominating persons to be elected to general district court judgeships.

 

 

Agreed to by the Senate, January 14, 2025

 

RESOLVED by the Senate of Virginia, That the following persons are hereby nominated to be elected to the respective general district court judgeships as follows:

The Honorable Erin L. Evans-Bedois, of Chesapeake, as a judge of the First Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.

The Honorable Sandra S. Menago, of Virginia Beach, as a judge of the Second Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025.

The Honorable Nicole A. Belote, of Suffolk, as a judge of the Fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Elbert D. Mumphery, of Hopewell, as a judge of the Sixth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Robert G. Saunders, of Newport News, as a judge of the Seventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Jody H. Fariss, of Prince Edward, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025.

The Honorable Darrel W. Puckett, of Appomattox, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025.

The Honorable Calvin S. Spencer, Jr., of Lunenburg, as a judge of the Tenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 16, 2025.

The Honorable Thomas Stark, IV, of Powhatan, as a judge of the Eleventh Judicial District for a term of six years commencing May 1, 2025.

The Honorable Keith Nelson Hurley, of Chesterfield, as a judge of the Twelfth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Lauren A. Caudill, of Henrico, as a judge of the Fourteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025.

The Honorable George Barton Chucker, of Henrico, as a judge of the Fourteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Hugh S. Campbell, of Hanover, as a judge of the Fifteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Angela M. O'Connor, of Hanover, as a judge of the Fifteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Matthew J. Quatrara, of Albemarle, as a judge of the Sixteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing June 1, 2025.

The Honorable Jason S. Rucker, of Arlington, as a judge of the Seventeenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing March 16, 2025.

The Honorable Susan F. Earman, of Fairfax City, as a judge of the Nineteenth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Joan Ziglar, of Martinsville, as a judge of the Twenty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Christopher M. Billias, of Rockbridge, as a judge of the Twenty-fifth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing April 1, 2025.

The Honorable Travis B. Lee, of Smyth, as a judge of the Twenty-eighth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Henry A. Barringer, of Tazewell, as a judge of the Twenty-ninth Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.

The Honorable Turkessa B. Rollins, of Prince William, as a judge of the Thirty-first Judicial District for a term of six years commencing July 1, 2025.