Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Read third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Rep. Harvey of Castleton withdrew demand for yeas and nays
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Read third time
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 106, Nays = 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Rep. Marcotte of Coventry, Carris-Duncan of Whitingham, Duke of Burlington, Graning of Jericho, Olson of Starksboro, Priestley of Bradford, and White of Bethel moved to amend the bill, which was agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Rep. Harvey of Castleton demanded yeas and nays
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2025
|
Action Calendar: Action postponed until 3/28/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to postpone action until 3/28/2025, which was agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2025
|
Action Calendar: Action postponed until 3/27/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to postpone action until 3/27/2025, which was agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Action Calendar: Action postponed until 3/25/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Rep. Marcotte of Coventry moved to postpone action until 3/25/2025, which was agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2025
|
Action Calendar: Action postponed until 3/21/2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Action Calendar: Third Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Third Reading ordered
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 72 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 99, Nays = 45
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Rep. Headrick of Burlington demanded yeas and nays
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Rep. Donahue of Northfield raised a Point of Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Rep. Priestley of Bradford reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Read second time
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2025
|
Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2025
|
Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved that the Committee on Judiciary be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, which was agreed to
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2025
|
Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|