House | 03/26/2025 | Senate Message: Adopted in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Adopted in concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Resolutions for Adoption in Concurrence | ||
Senate | 03/21/2025 | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Read and adopted | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Action Calendar: On Action Calendar pursuant to Rule 52 | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Read and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |