Senate | 03/17/2025 | Senate Rules "X" file. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | ||
Senate | 02/26/2025 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | TRAN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Law & Justice. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Minority; without recommendation. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2025 | Minority; do not pass. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. | ||
Senate | 01/17/2025 | Referred to Transportation. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | And refer to Transportation. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2025 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. | ||
Senate | 01/13/2025 | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. | ||
Senate | 12/16/2024 | Prefiled for introduction. |