House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 0 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Penterman | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Introduced |