House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 201
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-13-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 2
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 14, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Joers and Hurd
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Representative Riemer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|