Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Representative Jacobson withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Representatives Conley, Madison, Palmeri and Subeck withdrawn as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 6
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Stubbs withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Representative Joers withdrawn as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Binsfeld
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|