Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 02/16/2024 | Representatives Sinicki and Subeck withdrawn as coauthors | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 4 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representative Stubbs withdrawn as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced |