House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Schraa | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Introduced |