Wisconsin 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AB1056 Comm Sub / Analysis

                    Wisconsin Legislative Council 
AMENDMENT MEMO 
One Ea st Ma in Stre e t, Suite 401 • Ma dison, W I 53703 • (608) 266-1304 • le g.council@le gis.wisconsin.gov • http://www.le gis.wisconsin.gov/lc 
Memo published: February 15, 2024 	Contact: Amber Otis, Senior Staff Attorney 
2023 Assembly Bill 1056 Assembly Amendment 1 
BACKGROUND 
Current law allows the Department of Health Services (DHS) to require counties to maintain a specified 
level of contribution for the Children’s Long-Term Support (CLTS) program. DHS must determine the 
amount of contribution that a county is required to maintain based on the historical county 
expenditures for the CLTS program. Counties must cooperate with DHS to determine an equitable 
funding methodology and county contribution mechanism, and must also ensure that the county 
contributions are expended for CLTS program in the counties. In addition, current law authorizes DHS 
to contract with a county or a group of counties to deliver CLTS services. 
2023 ASSEMBLY BILL 1056 
Under Assembly Bill 1056, the funding methodology described above no longer applies after December 
31, 2024. Rather, the bill requires that, beginning on the bill’s effective date, DHS must cooperate with 
counties to review county contributions for the CLTS program and develop a revised funding 
methodology to take effect on January 1, 2025. In developing the revised funding methodology, DHS 
may not require a county to maintain any level of contribution for the CLTS program.  
The bill also requires that DHS, by June 1, 2024, report to certain legislative committees the amount 
and source of funds that may be reallocated following implementation of the revised funding 
methodology.  
ASSEMBLY AMENDMENT 1 
Assembly Amendment 1 modifies the bill as follows: 
 Requires both DHS and the counties to cooperate in reviewing the county contributions and 
developing a revised funding methodology, rather than requiring DHS to cooperate with counties, 
as provided under the bill.  
 Extends the revised funding methodology’s effective date to July 1, 2025, rather than January 1, 
2025, as provided in the bill.  
 Specifies that a county or group of counties that has contracted with DHS to deliver CLTS services is 
responsible for completing the eligibility and enrollment process according to DHS policy. 
 Requires that a county or group of counties that has contracted with DHS to deliver CLTS services 
designate a support and service coordinator for a participant and the participant’s family as soon as 
possible after a participant is referred to the CLTS program, and further requires the coordinator to 
complete a participant’s individual service plan within 90 calendar days of the date on which the 
participant was referred to the CLTS program.   - 2 - 
BILL HISTORY 
Representative Schraa offered Assembly Amendment 1 on February 13, 2024. On February 15, 2024, 
the Assembly Committee on Children and Families recommended adoption of the amendment, and 
passage of the bill, as amended, on votes of Ayes, 12; Noes, 0. 
For a full history of the bill, visit the Legislature’s bill history page. 
AO:ksm