House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Emerson | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Made a special order of business at 11:03 AM on 2-22-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 28 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Summerfield | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 10, Noes 5 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Edming added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Introduced |