House
|
12/06/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 60
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 9-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 29, Noes 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 5, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 95, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Representatives Maxey and Ratcliff added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dallman
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Representative Myers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Drake added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|