House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 11, Noes 5
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Gustafson
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2023
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Representative Sapik added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Representative Melotik added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/28/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
07/12/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Donovan added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Representative Gundrum added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Commissioner of Insurance report received pursuant to s.601.423(2), Wisconsin Statutes
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|