Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:03 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/05/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 7, Noes 4 | ||
House | 10/04/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/06/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Introduced |