House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Brandtjen
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Representative Schutt added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Brandtjen
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Representative Vining added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Representative Billings added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Representative Shankland added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
07/31/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
07/11/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|