Senate
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 14, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/07/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Dittrich
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|