House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:04 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Representative Pronschinske added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Representative Dallman added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Introduced |