House
|
12/06/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 42
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 11-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 31, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Representatives Cabrera, Drake and Rozar added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 98, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Taken from the table
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Laid on the table
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Joint Committee on Finance, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
10/31/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Referred to joint committee on Finance
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 12, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
10/26/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Agriculture, Ayes 6, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Oldenburg
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Representative Billings added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|