House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representative Goeben | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Goeben | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |