House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 9, Noes 4 | ||
House | 10/10/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 07/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 07/19/2023 | Representative Dittrich added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |