House
|
12/06/2023
|
Published 12-7-2023
|
|
|
House
|
12/06/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 12-6-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 61
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 11-30-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 9-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/08/2023
|
Representative Maxey added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/05/2023
|
Senator James added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 96, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Representative Cabrera added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Representative Steffen added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|