House
|
04/15/2024
|
Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Representative Emerson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 11, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention, Ayes 8, Noes 4
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
10/23/2023
|
Representative J. Anderson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Senator Roys added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Representative Considine added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2023
|
Representative Stubbs added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2023
|
Representative Hong added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
10/04/2023
|
Representatives C. Anderson, Donovan and Goyke added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
09/22/2023
|
Representative Bare added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell
|
|
|
House
|
06/19/2023
|
Representative Joers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Representative Subeck added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Snodgrass added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Senator Agard added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Representative Conley added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Fiscal estimate received
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse Prevention
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|