House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/10/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 12/06/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Moses | ||
House | 08/10/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |