House
|
08/04/2023
|
Published 8-5-2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Report approved by the Governor on 8-4-2023. 2023 Wisconsin Act 33
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Presented to the Governor on 8-2-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Report correctly enrolled on 6-15-2023
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2023
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Read a third time and passed, Ayes 83, Noes 13
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-7-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 5, Noes 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|