House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 15, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 10/26/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Introduced |