House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 176
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 1-17-2024
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2024
|
Placed on calendar 1-16-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 7, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2024
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2023
|
Placed on calendar 6-21-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care, Ayes 15, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Representative Vining added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Health, Aging and Long-Term Care
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|