House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 09/27/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Tourism, Ayes 11, Noes 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 03/17/2023 | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Tourism | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Introduced |