House
|
04/05/2024
|
Published 4-5-2024
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 4-4-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 266
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 4-1-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Representative Neubauer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-20-2024 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2023
|
Representative Haywood added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representative Riemer added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/30/2023
|
Senator L. Johnson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
10/10/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
House
|
09/18/2023
|
Representative McGuire added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/28/2023
|
Senator Larson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2023
|
Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
08/01/2023
|
Representative Moore Omokunde added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Senator Hesselbein added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Representative Wichgers added as a coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representatives Bare and Billings added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|