House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative O'Connor added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 11/02/2023 | Placed on calendar 11-7-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | ||
House | 10/03/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/11/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Forestry, Parks and Outdoor Recreation | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |