House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 11/06/2023 | Representative Gustafson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 10/19/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 14, Noes 0 | ||
House | 09/28/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/25/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Shelton | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Representative Palmeri added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Representative C. Anderson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education | ||
House | 02/10/2023 | Introduced |