House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 01/17/2024 | Representatives Emerson, Gustafson and Duchow added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Placed on calendar 1-18-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Consumer Protection, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 06/05/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Representative Schmidt added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Representatives Madison and Clancy added as coauthors | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Consumer Protection | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Introduced |