House
|
03/25/2024
|
Published 3-23-2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-22-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 196
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled on 2-16-2024
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Received from Senate concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/14/2023
|
Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/21/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Mental Health, Substance Abuse Prevention, Children and Families
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/15/2023
|
Received from Assembly
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
|
|
|
House
|
11/14/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Wichgers
|
|
|
House
|
11/13/2023
|
Representatives Gustafson and O'Connor added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Placed on calendar 11-14-2023 by Committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 11, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/09/2023
|
Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Children and Families, Ayes 11, Noes 1
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
11/01/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Children and Families
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|